CO SB254 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reforms to child welfare services, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Child Welfare Reforms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-254 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-254 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-254 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-254 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-254 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-254 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-01 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |