CO SB254 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the nursing home penalty cash fund, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing Home Penalty Cash Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-254 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-254 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Governor Signed
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-254
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_254_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_254_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_254_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_254_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_254_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_254_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b529953e24c63e92872583e5004d7388-sb19-254-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-254vote566aef
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/af81279dd73d8754872583e9004ede17-sb19-254-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-254vote5a4ec7

Bill Comments

feedback