CO SB260 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning entry into the fire and police pension association for social security employers.
Title
Entry Into FPPA Fire and Police Pension Association For Social Security Employers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-260 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-260 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-260 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-260 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |