CO SJR045 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
22q11.2 Deletion Syndrome Awareness Week
Title
22q11.2 Deletion Syndrome Awareness Week
Sponsors
Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] | Rep. Max Tyler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-09 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/206E1B453CA4FE648725786200709A53?Open |