CT HB05049 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - File Number 212
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - File Number 212
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to the general statutes relating to the Department of Banking.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Banking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | File Number 212 | |
2010-03-30 | House Calendar Number 126 | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |