CT HB05057 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 268
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 268
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Standardizing Drive-only Licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Christopher Rosario [D] | Rep. Juan Candelaria [D] | Rep. Anabel Figueroa [D] |
Rep. Farley Santos [D] | Rep. Robert Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-18 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 268 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 186 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |