CT HB05076 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To restore Alewife Cove in order to improve animal habitat and promote economic development.
Title
An Act Concerning The Restoration Of Alewife Cove In New London And Waterford.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Change of Reference) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-02 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-18 | House | Change of Reference Appropriations |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |