CT HB05099 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow backers and holders of caterer liquor permits to also be backers and holders of manufacturer permits for brew pubs and manufacturer permits for beer and brew pubs.
Title
An Act Concerning Caterer, Brew Pub Manufacturer And Beer And Brew Pub Manufacturer Alcoholic Liquor Permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 388 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 26 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 26 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-20 | House | Public Act 14-135 |
2014-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-04-11 | House | Senate Calendar Number 327 |
2014-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Passed |
2014-03-26 | House | File Number 132 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 81 |
2014-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |