CT HB05174 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 401
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 401
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow the installation of temporary shelter units for persons experiencing homelessness on real property owned by religious organizations.
Title
An Act Concerning Temporary Shelter Units For Persons Experiencing Homelessness Or Refugees Located On Real Property Owned By Religious Organizations.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. David Michel [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] |
Rep. Anne Hughes [D] | Sen. MD Rahman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 6 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 6 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | File Number 401 |
2024-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 257 |
2024-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |