CT HB05209 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow a housing authority to expand its jurisdiction to include neighboring municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning Housing Authority Jurisdiction.
Sponsors
House Housing Committee | Rep. Susan Johnson [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Rep. Juan Candelaria [D] | Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Edwin Vargas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet-A (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet-A (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-31 | House | File Number 229 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 192 |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |