CT HB05227 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - File Number 56
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - File Number 56
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection to release liens within a certain period of time when such lien has been satisfied.
Title
An Act Concerning The Release Of Certain Liens Of The Department Of Energy And Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | File Number 56 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 68 |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |