CT HB05229 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Senate Calendar Number 517
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Senate Calendar Number 517
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To change the exemption from reporting requirements from any public official, Governor's spouse or state employee who is a principal speaker at an event to any such official, spouse or employee who is an active participant at an event and to require lobbyists to report necessary expenses paid to a public official or state employee in their next financial report rather than as a separate report within thirty days.
Title
An Act Changing Certain Reporting Requirements In The State Codes Of Ethics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 109 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Senate Calendar Number 517 |
2016-04-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-25 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | File Number 524 |
2016-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 326 |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |