CT HB05229 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 337
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 337
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement certain of the recommendations of the eelgrass working group that are intended to assist in the preservation and restoration of eelgrass in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Eelgrass Working Group.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Aundre Bumgardner [R] | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] |
Rep. Christine Palm [D] | Sen. Jan Hochadel [D] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] | Rep. Ben Mcgorty [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 28 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 337 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | File Number 189 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 155 |
2024-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |