CT HB05232 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Senate Recommitted to Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Senate Recommitted to Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To align state statutes concerning service animals with federal law.
Title
An Act Concerning Service Animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 48 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | House | Senate Recommitted to Human Services |
2022-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 418 |
2022-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | House Passed |
2022-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-22 | House | File Number 81 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 94 |
2022-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |