CT HB05239 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - File Number 609
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - File Number 609
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) make nonprofit organizations that provide collegiate awareness and preparation programs eligible for grants, (2) establish an earlier application deadline and a one-year award period, and (3) increase funding for the Connecticut collegiate awareness and preparation program.
Title
An Act Expanding The Connecticut Collegiate Awareness And Preparation Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | File Number 609 |
2024-04-24 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-24 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-02 | House | File Number 179 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 156 |
2024-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |