CT HB05243 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To permit the board members and other employees of the Connecticut Housing Finance Authority to obtain an equivalent insurance product in lieu of a surety bond.
Title
An Act Concerning Bonds Of Board Members And Other Employees Of The Connecticut Housing Finance Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |