CT HB05246 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - Senate Calendar Number 386
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - Senate Calendar Number 386
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that a permit to sell pistols or revolvers authorizes the holder of such permit to also make sales at any meeting or exhibition of an organized collectors' group or any gun show.
Title
An Act Concerning The Permit To Sell Pistols Or Revolvers.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Esposito [D] | Rep. Frank Nicastro [D] | Rep. Selim Noujaim [R] | Rep. Christopher Perone [D] |
Rep. John Piscopo [R] | House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. Daniel Rovero [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 93 (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Senate Calendar Number 386 | |
2012-04-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-18 | House Passed | |
2012-03-29 | File Number 179 | |
2012-03-29 | House Calendar Number 146 | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-15 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |