CT HB05253 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Senate Calendar Number 450
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Senate Calendar Number 450
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow for more timely processing of child support orders when the obligor is receiving workers' compensation benefits.
Title
An Act Concerning Improvements To Income Withholding For Child Support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 59 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 450 |
2016-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-13 | House | File Number 590 |
2016-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 361 |
2016-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |