CT HB05264 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure volunteer fire departments and ambulance companies are considered under CONN-OSHA jurisdiction.
Title
An Act Concerning Volunteer Fire Departments And Ambulance Companies And The Definition Of Employer Under The State Occupational Safety And Health Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2024-03-20 | House | File Number 57 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 69 |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |