CT HB05266 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Senate Calendar Number 456
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Senate Calendar Number 456
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 31-225a of the general statutes to shorten the time an employer can protest any unemployment benefits they contend have been improperly charged to their employer unemployment insurance quarterly statements due to fraud or error from sixty days to forty days.
Title
An Act Amending The Time To Protest Benefit Charges On An Employer's Unemployment Insurance Quarterly Statement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 155 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 456 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2024-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5421 |
2024-03-20 | House | File Number 59 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 71 |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |