CT HB05267 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Senate Calendar Number 457
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Senate Calendar Number 457
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Labor Department by (1) making changes to statutes relevant to the Labor Department, and (2) repealing obsolete provisions and statutes relevant to the Labor Department.
Title
An Act Making Changes To And Repealing Obsolete Provisions Of Statutes Relevant To The Labor Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 154 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 457 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2024-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5168 |
2024-03-20 | House | File Number 60 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 72 |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |