CT HB05270 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-01 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-01 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow eligible patients to try investigational drugs, biological products or devices.
Title
An Act Concerning The Right To Try Experimental Drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-22 | House | File Number 106 |
2016-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 100 |
2016-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |