CT HB05300 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 362
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 362
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to consider certain businesses that do not have their principal business operations in Connecticut to be eligible businesses under the invest CT fund program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Invest Ct Fund Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | File Number 362 |
2024-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 237 |
2024-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |