CT HB05330 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 274
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 274
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Transportation concerning certain environmental hearings, the Office of the State Traffic Administration, bicycle traffic, traffic authorities, variable speed limits, public transportation, motorcycle helmets and reckless driving.
Title
An Act Implementing Recommendations Of The Department Of Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 274 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 191 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |