CT HB05342 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify that targeted brownfield loans may be used for affordable housing projects.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The State's Brownfield Remediation And Development Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 459 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-06-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-183 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Rules Suspended | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Calendar Number 529 | |
2012-05-09 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-08 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2012-05-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-08 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-08 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5280 | |
2012-04-24 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-24 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-20 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-16 | File Number 441 | |
2012-04-16 | House Calendar Number 338 | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-27 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |