CT HB05348 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To change the definition of Class I renewable energy source to include certain useful thermal energy generated from biodiesel and to create a homeowner-generated useful thermal energy program.
Title
An Act Requiring The Consideration Of Creating A Portfolio Standard For Thermal Energy In The Next Integrated Resources Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 337 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 276 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 276 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Public Act 18-180 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 558 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5832 |
2018-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | House | File Number 245 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 178 |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |