CT HB05352 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide a tire stewardship organization with more time to begin the tire stewardship program after the plan is approved, to reduce allowable administrative fees for the tire stewardship program and to allow a surplus for the tire stewardship program to avoid cash flow problems.
Title
An Act Concerning Minor Revisions To The Tire Stewardship Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 58 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4244 |
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 278 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 195 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |