CT HB05383 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) extend the notice periods before a participating provider's departure or removal from a provider network, and (2) require that health carriers and participating providers that are hospitals continue to abide by the terms of certain contracts for sixty days.
Title
An Act Concerning Disputes Between Health Carriers And Participating Providers That Are Hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 351 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 42 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 42 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-25 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-25 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-23 | House | Public Act 18-115 |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-20 | House | File Number 622 |
2018-04-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 373 |
2018-04-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-04-18 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3710 |
2018-04-09 | House | File Number 316 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 211 |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |