CT HB05395 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To assist elderly persons and persons with disabilities to live at home longer.
Title
An Act Concerning Aging In Place.
Sponsors
House Aging Committee | Rep. John Hampton [D] | Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D] | Rep. Michelle Cook [D] |
Rep. David Zoni [D] | Rep. Theresa Conroy [D] | Rep. Jay Case [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-27 | House | File Number 162 |
2014-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 121 |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |