CT HB05399 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 287
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 287
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish a council to develop a model policy related to the criminal justice response to sexual assault and require distribution of such policy to law enforcement units, (2) establish responsibilities of a peace officer at the scene of a sexual assault incident, and (3) require development and distribution of information about services for victims of sexual assault.
Title
An Act Concerning The Criminal Justice Response To Victims Of Sexual Assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 287 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 204 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |