CT HB05404 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that, for any veteran or member of the armed forces who has military fire department training and experience related to operation of fire apparatus, the requirements for a "Q" driver's license endorsement shall be waived on submission of certain evidence that such veteran or member possesses the skills necessary for operation of fire apparatus.
Title
An Act Concerning Military Training And Experience And The Driver's License Endorsement To Operate Fire Apparatus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Transportation |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation |
2024-03-28 | House | File Number 176 |
2024-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 150 |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' and Military Affairs |