CT HB05443 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - File Number 236
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - File Number 236
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce the potential for unauthorized access of job applicants' personal information.
Title
An Act Concerning Disclosure Of Social Security Numbers On Employment Applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | File Number 236 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 200 |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |