CT HB05469 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 374
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - File Number 374
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To grant state employees two paid flexible holidays to swap with any legal holiday.
Title
An Act Concerning Flexible Holidays For State Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | File Number 374 |
2024-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 249 |
2024-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |