CT HB05480 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 242
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 242
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical revisions to public safety statutes.
Title
An Act Making Technical Revisions To Public Safety Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | File Number 242 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 183 |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |