CT HB05481 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to the State Personnel Act statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Changes To The State Personnel Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 378 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 199 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 199 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Public Act 18-130 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 512 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-04 | Senate | File Number 682 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5002 |
2018-04-04 | House | File Number 204 |
2018-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 163 |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |