CT HB05482 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - File Number 98
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - File Number 98
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the scope of section 8-68f of the general statutes and to ensure that the Department of Housing promptly adopts the regulations required under said section.
Title
An Act Concerning Public Housing Grievance Procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | File Number 98 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 76 |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |