CT HB05522 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 586
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - File Number 586
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To convey a parcel of state land in the town of Woodstock to the YMCA of Metropolitan Hartford, Inc. for seasonal recreation and other purposes related to Camp Woodstock.
Title
An Act Conveying A Parcel Of State Land In The Town Of Woodstock.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Jeff Gordon [R] | Rep. Patrick Boyd [D] | Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | File Number 586 |
2024-04-22 | House | House Calendar Number 420 |
2024-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-04-04 | House | Public Hearing 04/09 |
2024-04-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |