CT HB05526 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Judicial Department to make available on its Internet web site a written summary of employment standards for judicial marshals.
Title
An Act Concerning Standards For The Selection, Retention And Promotion Of Judicial Marshals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 350 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-13 | Public Act 10-94 | |
2010-05-04 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-29 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-29 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-29 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Calendar Number 454 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-20 | House Passed | |
2010-04-15 | File Number 565 | |
2010-04-15 | House Calendar Number 355 | |
2010-04-15 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-29 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-29 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Public Hearing 03/26 | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |