CT HB05526 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 773
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit persons who were sentenced prior to the abolishment of good time credits from continuing to collect such credits and to permit such persons to earn risk reduction credits if otherwise eligible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Good Time Credits And The Earned Risk Reduction Credit Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 773
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 481
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-11HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-09HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-01HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback