CT HB05535 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require hospitals to provide patients with notice of placement in observation status and to require providers of health care and counseling services to provide notice of their qualifications and a description of the services provided.
Title
An Act Concerning Notice Of A Patient's Observation Status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 433 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 227 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 227 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Public Act 14-180 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,C |
2014-05-03 | Senate | File Number 754 |
2014-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 566 |
2014-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2014-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C |
2014-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 4926 |
2014-05-02 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 5012 |
2014-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4636 |
2014-04-09 | House | File Number 475 |
2014-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 283 |
2014-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |