CT HB05545 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Specify that a person is liable in contract to pay for the cost of services delivered by an ambulance provider, (2) clarify the purposes for which certain health care provider bills may be used in personal injury and wrongful death actions, and (3) specify that the provisions of public act 11-205 apply to actions pending on or after July 1, 2011.
Title
An Act Concerning Financial Liability For Ambulance Services, Evidence Of Collateral Source Payments And Evidence Of Bills From Treating Healthcare Providers.
Sponsors
Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D] | Rep. Emil Altobello [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | House Judiciary Committee |
Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 385 PASS (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-29 | Public Act 12-142 | |
2012-05-09 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-04 | File Number 639 | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Calendar Number 484 | |
2012-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2012-05-03 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-03 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4477 | |
2012-04-19 | File Number 549 | |
2012-04-19 | House Calendar Number 404 | |
2012-04-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-13 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-02 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-19 | Public Hearing 03/23 | |
2012-03-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |