CT HB05581 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize municipal boards of assessment appeals to hear sewer assessment appeals, to require persons seeking a property tax exemption for machinery and equipment used in connection with biotechnology to file an application with the assessor and to authorize municipalities to grant extensions and exemptions for such applications.
Title
An Act Concerning Sewer Assessment Appeals And The Approval Of Certain Property Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Louis Esposito [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] |
Rep. Theresa Conroy [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 400 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 62 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 62 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | House | Public Act 14-183 |
2014-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 429 |
2014-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | House Passed |
2014-04-10 | House | File Number 508 |
2014-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 301 |
2014-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |