CT HB05590 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To study and improve the workforce development system in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Workforce Development System In The State Of Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 388 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 344 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 82 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 347 AS AMENDED (Y: 88 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 344 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 82 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 347 AS AMENDED (Y: 88 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-22 | House | Public Act 17-207 |
2017-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 599 |
2017-06-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8658 |
2017-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-27 | House | File Number 213 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 166 |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2017-03-03 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |