CT HB05607 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - File Number 586
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - File Number 586
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To add persons who repair cameras or develop or print film, recordings or images to the list of mandated reporters.
Title
An Act Concerning Film Developers And Camera Repair Persons As Mandated Reporters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | File Number 586 |
2016-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 360 |
2016-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |