CT HB05682 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to amend the policy of the Department of Children and Families concerning financial assistance for post-secondary education expenses by expanding the provision of such assistance to any individual adopted through the department on or after January 1, 2001.
Title
An Act Concerning Financial Assistance For Post-secondary Education Expenses For Certain Individuals Adopted Through The Department Of Children And Families Foster Care Program.
Sponsors
House Committee on Children | Rep. William Petit [R] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Dave Yaccarino [R] |
Sen. Leonard Fasano [R] | Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 175 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 125 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2019-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |