CT HB05903 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that an adjourned primary resulting from a tie vote for a state office or the office of state senator or state representative only includes those candidates who were in a tie vote.
Title
An Act Concerning The Resolution Of Tie Votes In Primaries For State Or District Offices And For The Office Of State Senator Or State Representative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 607 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 90 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 90 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | House | Public Act 13-269 |
2013-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 519 |
2013-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-02 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-23 | House | File Number 593 |
2013-04-23 | House | House Calendar Number 405 |
2013-04-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-03-27 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2013-02-04 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |