CT HB05925 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-31 - File Number 809
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-31 - File Number 809
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the penalties for intentional violation of minimum bottle provisions.
Title
An Act Concerning The Inspection Of Shipments Of Alcoholic Liquor And Penalties For Intentional Violations Of The Alcoholic Liquor Minimum Bottle Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 274 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | File Number 809 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 560 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2017-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8070 |
2017-03-16 | House | File Number 67 |
2017-03-16 | House | House Calendar Number 79 |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2017-03-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 01/31 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |