CT HB05972 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate Calendar Number 411
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To protect the interests of elderly or deceased depositors and their heirs from inappropriate use of joint accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Presumption Of Ownership In Joint Bank Accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 54 (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 411
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Passed
2019-03-19HouseFile Number 62
2019-03-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 55
2019-03-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-05HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-05HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Banking
2019-02-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-05HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback