CT HB06113 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 398
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To restrict employers from requiring an applicant's date of birth or date of graduation on an initial employment application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting Employers From Inquiring About Date Of Birth Or Date Of Graduation On Employment Applications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 398
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 251
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-03-13HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-29HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback