CT HB06161 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit insurance companies from using an applicant's or insured's credit history as a factor in underwriting or rating private passenger nonfleet automobile insurance policies.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Insurance Companies From Using Credit History As A Factor In Underwriting Or Rating Private Passenger Nonfleet Automobile Insurance Policies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-03-11 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-03 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |